NJ A5277 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.342.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.342.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates term limits for members of State Board of Examiners of Master Plumbers and State Board of Examiners of Heating, Ventilating, Air Conditioning and Refrigeration Contractors.
Title
Eliminates term limits for members of State Board of Examiners of Master Plumbers and State Board of Examiners of Heating, Ventilating, Air Conditioning and Refrigeration Contractors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3734 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.342. |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted for S3734 |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3734 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A5277