NJ A5312 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2281
Note: Carry Foward to future S1078
Note: Carry Foward to future S1078
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Commissioner of Human Services to streamline SNAP application process for senior citizens and conduct outreach regarding senior SNAP participation.
Title
Requires Commissioner of Human Services to streamline SNAP application process for senior citizens and conduct outreach regarding senior SNAP participation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5312 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5312 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3710 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5312 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3710 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee