NJ A5323 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2998 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2998 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires creditors to make certain disclosures regarding collateral protection insurance to consumer debtors.*
Title
Requires creditors to make certain disclosures regarding collateral protection insurance to consumer debtors.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S2998 (3R) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2998 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.312.