NJ A5346 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A802
Note: Carry Foward to future S1352
Note: Carry Foward to future S1352
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain retailers to train employees on gift card fraud.*
Title
Requires certain retailers to train employees on gift card fraud.*
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] |
Rep. Pedro Mejia [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-2-4) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5346 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5346 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S4322 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5346 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S4322 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee