NJ A536 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1627
Note: Carry Over of previous A4399
Note: Carry Over of previous A4399
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2107 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2107 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides PERS or PFRS member who continues to be volunteer firefighter or emergency services worker after retirement with employer from whom member retires has bona fide severance for compliance with State and federal law.*
Title
Provides PERS or PFRS member who continues to be volunteer firefighter or emergency services worker after retirement with employer from whom member retires has bona fide severance for compliance with State and federal law.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted by S2107 (2R) |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Tucker) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A536 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2107 (2R)
A4399 (Carry Over) 2015-05-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2107 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)
A4399 (Carry Over) 2015-05-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2107 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)