NJ A5380 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2863 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2863 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for grant recipients of Transportation Trust Fund Authority local aid program.
Title
Revises requirements for grant recipients of Transportation Trust Fund Authority local aid program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S2863 (4R) |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2863 (Same As) 2019-06-26 - Approved P.L.2019, c.135.