NJ A5381 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Approved P.L.2019, c.140.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Approved P.L.2019, c.140.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes State Treasurer to sell surplus real property located in City of Trenton, Mercer County.
Title
Authorizes State Treasurer to sell surplus real property located in City of Trenton, Mercer County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3824 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.140. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted for S3824 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3824 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5381