NJ A5384 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A298
Note: Carry Foward to future A2773
Note: Legislation replaced by S3393
Note: Carry Foward to future A2773
Note: Legislation replaced by S3393
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3393 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3393 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain preserved farms to hold 14 special occasion events per year; imposes further event restrictions on residentially-exposed preserved farms.*
Title
Allows certain preserved farms to hold 14 special occasion events per year; imposes further event restrictions on residentially-exposed preserved farms.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S3393 (1R) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5384 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3393 (1R)
A5384 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3393 (1R)
S3393 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S3393 (Replaced by) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A5384 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3393 (1R)
S3393 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S3393 (Replaced by) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session