NJ A5394 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3878 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Reaffirms and clarifies that Attorney General and Division on Civil Rights may initiate actions in Superior Court to enforce "Law Against Discrimination."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reaffirms and clarifies that Attorney General and Division on Civil Rights may initiate actions in Superior Court to enforce "Law Against Discrimination."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13AssemblySubstituted by S3878 (SCS)
2019-12-09AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2019-12-05AssemblyTransferred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2019-05-20AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3878 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-3-5)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback