NJ A5396 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes process to obtain judgement of adoption for civil union partner or spouse of natural or legal parent of child when that person is named as parent on child's birth certificate.
Title
Establishes process to obtain judgement of adoption for civil union partner or spouse of natural or legal parent of child when that person is named as parent on child's birth certificate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S3528 |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-09 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3528 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.323.