NJ A5425 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2280
Note: Carry Foward to future S1763
Note: Carry Foward to future S1763
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain substance use disorder treatment facilities from paying fees, commissions, or rebates to any person to refer patients to facility. *
Title
Prohibits certain substance use disorder treatment facilities from paying fees, commissions, or rebates to any person to refer patients to facility. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter) |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5425 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5425 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S4021 (Same As) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5425 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S4021 (Same As) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee