NJ A543 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5307

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on October 29 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises psychologist training requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises psychologist training requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2582 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-29SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)
2020-10-29SenateSubstituted for S2582
2020-07-22SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-07-22SenateTransferred to Senate Commerce Committee
2020-02-24SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2020-02-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
2020-01-27AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5307 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2582 (Same As) 2020-10-29 - Substituted by A543 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback