NJ A5447 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1914
Note: Carry Over of previous A5291
Note: Carry Over of previous A5291
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-05 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-05 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain senior citizens to apply for rent increase limit.
Title
Allows certain senior citizens to apply for rent increase limit.
Sponsors
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Jamel Holley [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5447 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1480 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Withdrawn from Consideration
A5291 (Carry Over) 2017-12-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A1480 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Withdrawn from Consideration
A5291 (Carry Over) 2017-12-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee