NJ A5451 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1163
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes public awareness campaign about Pregnant Women/Women With Dependent Children initiative and Maternal Wrap Around program.
Title
Establishes public awareness campaign about Pregnant Women/Women With Dependent Children initiative and Maternal Wrap Around program.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. John Armato [D] |
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5451 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee