NJ A5463 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.266.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Permits owner of 10 percent or more of member team of sports governing body to place or accept wagers on certain sports events in which other member teams participate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits owner of 10 percent or more of member team of sports governing body to place or accept wagers on certain sports events in which other member teams participate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3972 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-13SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.266.
2019-08-26SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-1)
2019-08-26SenateSubstituted for S3972
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2019-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-06-17AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3972 (Same As) 2019-08-26 - Substituted by A5463

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback