NJ A5507 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2215
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Approved P.L.2019, c.360.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Approved P.L.2019, c.360.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health benefits coverage for certain preventive services.
Title
Requires health benefits coverage for certain preventive services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3803 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3803 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.360. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-3) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-1) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S3803 (1R) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-1-1) |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5507 (Carry Over) 2020-01-16 - Approved P.L.2019, c.360.
S3803 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5507 (1R)
S3803 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5507 (1R)