NJ A5508 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Approved P.L.2019, c.361.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Approved P.L.2019, c.361.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises law requiring health benefits coverage for certain contraceptives.
Title
Revises law requiring health benefits coverage for certain contraceptives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3804 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3804 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.361. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (52-23-1) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-15) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Substituted for S3804 (2R) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-0) (Ruiz) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-25-3) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Motion To Table (51-24-0) (Greenwald) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Howarth) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3804 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A5508 (2R)