NJ A5535 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1593
Note: Carry Foward to future S721
Note: Carry Foward to future S721
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires promulgation of separate code criteria for certain buildings.
Title
Requires promulgation of separate code criteria for certain buildings.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Matthew Milam [D] | Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] |
Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Rep. John Armato [D] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] | Rep. Ryan Peters [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5535 (Carry Over) 2019-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5535 (Carry Over) 2019-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3951 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5535 (Carry Over) 2019-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3951 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee