NJ A5536 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S720
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DCA to establish training course concerning certain fire code enforcement activities.*
Title
Requires DCA to establish training course concerning certain fire code enforcement activities.*
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Milam [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Rep. John Armato [D] |
Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5536 (Carry Over) 2019-06-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3950 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3950 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee