NJ A5623 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2057
Note: Carry Foward to future S112
Note: Carry Foward to future S112
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Applies law governing equal employment opportunity and affirmative action to gubernatorial transition staff members.
Title
Applies law governing equal employment opportunity and affirmative action to gubernatorial transition staff members.
Sponsors
Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] |
Sen. Holly Schepisi [R] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5623 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A5623 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3583 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A5623 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3583 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee