NJ A5625 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.345.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.345.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires payment of expenses related to background investigations for certain gubernatorial transition positions.
Title
Requires payment of expenses related to background investigations for certain gubernatorial transition positions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3976 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.345. |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted for S3976 |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3976 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A5625