NJ A5630 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.508.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Civil Service Commission to establish and maintain hotline for State employees to submit reports of workplace discrimination and harassment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires Civil Service Commission to establish and maintain hotline for State employees to submit reports of workplace discrimination and harassment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3981 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.508.
2020-01-13AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0)
2020-01-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-01-13SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2020-01-13SenateSubstituted for S3981 (2R)
2020-01-09SenateSenate Amendment (33-0) (Weinberg)
2019-11-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2019-06-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-06-17AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3981 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5630 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback