NJ A5667 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S64
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.509.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.509.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Charlie's Law"; requires pharmacy practice sites and hospice programs to furnish patients with information and means to safely dispose of unused prescription drugs and medications.
Title
"Charlie's Law"; requires pharmacy practice sites and hospice programs to furnish patients with information and means to safely dispose of unused prescription drugs and medications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3933 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.509. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S3933 (2R) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5667 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.509.
S3933 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5667 (2R)
S3933 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A5667 (2R)