NJ A5702 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1918
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4035
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4035
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes Fiscal Year 2020 supplemental appropriation of $1,700,000 for Thomas Edison State University.
Title
Makes Fiscal Year 2020 supplemental appropriation of $1,700,000 for Thomas Edison State University.
Sponsors
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S4035 |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5702 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S4035
S4035 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S4035 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session