NJ A5801 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1136
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.510.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.510.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns responsibility of contractors for wage claims against subcontractors.*
Title
Concerns responsibility of contractors for wage claims against subcontractors.*
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4064 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4064 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.510. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (61-11-3) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (31-8) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Substituted for S4064 (2R) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Singleton) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (59-6-8) |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5801 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.510.
S4064 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A5801 (2R)
S4064 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A5801 (2R)