NJ A5838 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.372.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.372.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns stop-work orders.
Title
Concerns stop-work orders.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4229 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-20 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.372. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (30-9) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Substituted for S4229 (2R) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (67-8-1) |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4229 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Substituted by A5838 (1R)