NJ A591 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5146
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.50.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.50.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination against cash-paying consumers.
Title
Prohibits discrimination against cash-paying consumers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2785 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.50. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-2-0) |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Substituted for S2785 (2R) |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment (28-0) (Pou) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-4-0) |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5146 (Carry Over) 2017-08-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2785 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by A591 (3R)
S2785 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by A591 (3R)