NJ A664 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A1029

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.64.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Codifies the Judiciary's Foreclosure Mediation Program; dedicates monies from foreclosure filing fees and fines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Codifies the Judiciary's Foreclosure Mediation Program; dedicates monies from foreclosure filing fees and fines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1244 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.64.
2019-03-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-2)
2019-03-25SenateSubstituted for S1244 (2R)
2019-03-25SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (61-19-0)
2019-02-25AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-10-22AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1029 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (53-17-0)
S1244 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A664 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback