NJ A702 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A931
Note: Carry Foward to future S1941
Note: Carry Over of previous A3989
Note: Carry Over of previous S2960
Note: Carry Foward to future S1941
Note: Carry Over of previous A3989
Note: Carry Over of previous S2960
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides State information technology contracts will require use of software to document computer use by contractor.
Title
Provides State information technology contracts will require use of software to document computer use by contractor.
Sponsors
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (65-4-4) |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A702 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A702 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3989 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
S1965 (Same As) 2020-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S2960 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A3989 (2R)
A702 (Carry Over) 2020-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3989 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
S1965 (Same As) 2020-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S2960 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A3989 (2R)