NJ A741 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1744
Note: Carry Over of previous A4781
Note: Carry Over of previous S4290
Note: Carry Over of previous A4781
Note: Carry Over of previous S4290
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.38.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.38.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes NJ Fuel Cell Task Force to increase use of fuel cells in State.
Title
Establishes NJ Fuel Cell Task Force to increase use of fuel cells in State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S762 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.38. |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Substituted for S762 (1R) |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A741 (Carry Over) 2020-06-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.38.
A4781 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S762 (Same As) 2020-06-15 - Substituted by A741
S4290 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4781 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S762 (Same As) 2020-06-15 - Substituted by A741
S4290 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee