NJ A744 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5439
Note: Carry Over of previous S4124
Note: Carry Over of previous S4124
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.52.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.52.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires law enforcement agencies to provide internal affairs and personnel files of law enforcement officers to other agencies under certain circumstances.
Title
Requires law enforcement agencies to provide internal affairs and personnel files of law enforcement officers to other agencies under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1482 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1482 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.52. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-1) |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Substituted for S1482 (1R) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5439 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1482 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Substituted by A744 (2R)
S4124 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1482 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Substituted by A744 (2R)
S4124 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee