NJ A769 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3254

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.185.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires school districts to incorporate age-appropriate sexual abuse and assault awareness and prevention education in grades preschool through 12 as part of New Jersey Student Learning Standards in Comprehensive Health and Physical Education.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires school districts to incorporate age-appropriate sexual abuse and assault awareness and prevention education in grades preschool through 12 as part of New Jersey Student Learning Standards in Comprehensive Health and Physical Education.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1130 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-19AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.185.
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
2019-03-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-03-25SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2019-03-25SenateSubstituted for S1130 (3R)
2018-12-17SenateSenate Amendment (39-0) (Bucco)
2018-10-29SenateSenate Amendment (40-0) (Bucco)
2018-10-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-22SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
2018-02-15AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
2018-02-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3254 (Carry Over) 2016-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S1130 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A769 (4R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback