NJ A801 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A653
Note: Carry Over of previous A5087
Note: Carry Over of previous S3429
Note: Carry Over of previous A5087
Note: Carry Over of previous S3429
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Require business seeking to perform State contract to disclose certain labor and employment law violations.
Title
Require business seeking to perform State contract to disclose certain labor and employment law violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A801 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A5087 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3502 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3429 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A5087 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S3502 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3429 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A801 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1000/801_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A801 |