NJ A895 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A6068
Note: Carry Over of previous S4159
Note: Carry Over of previous S4159
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that New Jersey Better Educational Savings Trust (NJBEST) Program scholarship may be awarded in any semester of attendance or enrollment at institution of higher education in State.
Title
Provides that New Jersey Better Educational Savings Trust (NJBEST) Program scholarship may be awarded in any semester of attendance or enrollment at institution of higher education in State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Substituted by S806 |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6068 (Carry Over) 2019-12-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S806 (Same As) 2020-09-14 - Approved P.L.2020, c.81.
S4159 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S806 (Same As) 2020-09-14 - Approved P.L.2020, c.81.
S4159 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A895 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1000/895_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=A895 |