NJ ACR113 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR142
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR112
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR105
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR25
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR112
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR105
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR25
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by SCR15 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by SCR15 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reconstitutes the "Joint Committee on Economic Justice and Equal Employment Opportunity."
Title
Reconstitutes the "Joint Committee on Economic Justice and Equal Employment Opportunity."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Substituted by SCR15 (1R) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR113 (Carry Over) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by SCR15 (1R)
ACR113 (Carry Over) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by SCR15 (1R)
SCR15 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
ACR105 (Carry Over) 2018-03-26 - Substituted by SCR25
SCR25 (Carry Over) 2018-03-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
ACR113 (Carry Over) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by SCR15 (1R)
SCR15 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
ACR105 (Carry Over) 2018-03-26 - Substituted by SCR25
SCR25 (Carry Over) 2018-03-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/ACR113 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/ACR/113_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR113 |