NJ ACR157 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR50
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR52
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR52
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs SCI to examine human trafficking activity at places of business of registered or illicit employers of massage and bodywork therapists.
Title
Directs SCI to examine human trafficking activity at places of business of registered or illicit employers of massage and bodywork therapists.
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] |
Rep. Jay Webber [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR157 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
ACR157 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
SCR112 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
ACR157 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
SCR112 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee