NJ ACR177 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges United States Trade Representative to take all appropriate remedial actions granted under Section 301 of "Trade Act of 1974" concerning unpaid Peruvian agrarian reform bonds.
Title
Urges United States Trade Representative to take all appropriate remedial actions granted under Section 301 of "Trade Act of 1974" concerning unpaid Peruvian agrarian reform bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SCR141 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SCR141 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (34-0) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for SCR141 |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-0-3) |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR141 (Same As) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by ACR177