NJ ACR178 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approves FY 2019 Financial Plan of NJ Infrastructure Bank.
Title
Approves FY 2019 Financial Plan of NJ Infrastructure Bank.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Samuel Thompson [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] |
Sen. Parker Space [R] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SCR122 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (40-0) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Substituted for SCR122 |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR122 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - Substituted by ACR178
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/ACR178 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/ACR/178_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR178 |