NJ ACR182 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Approves eligible historic preservation project in Camden County to receive low-interest loan utilizing monies from 1987 historic preservation bond act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Approves eligible historic preservation project in Camden County to receive low-interest loan utilizing monies from 1987 historic preservation bond act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SCR129 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateFiled with Secretary of State
2018-07-01SenateResolution Passed Senate (34-0)
2018-07-01SenateSubstituted for SCR129
2018-06-29SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-30AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (69-3-1)
2018-06-25AssemblyIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

SCR129 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - Substituted by ACR182

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback