NJ ACR190 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Governor and Lieutenant Governor to establish foreign trade office in Taiwan.
Title
Urges Governor and Lieutenant Governor to establish foreign trade office in Taiwan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For Scr155 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Substitute For Scr155 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for SCR155 |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2013-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR155 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by ACR190
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/ACR190 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/ACR/190_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR190 |