NJ ACR204 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on February 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on February 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges New Jersey Supreme Court to promote public awareness campaign for food growers to register as placement worksites for community service programs.
Title
Urges New Jersey Supreme Court to promote public awareness campaign for food growers to register as placement worksites for community service programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SCR151 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SCR151 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (76-0-0) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Substituted for SCR151 (1R) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-1) |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR151 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Substituted by ACR204 (1R)