NJ ACR221 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR110
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to pass legislation that exempts military retirement pay from federal income taxation.
Title
Urges Congress to pass legislation that exempts military retirement pay from federal income taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR221 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/ACR221 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/ACR/221_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR221 |