NJ ACR32 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR21
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Strongly encourages State Board of Medical Examiners to adopt regulations as necessary to authorize radiologist assistants to practice in New Jersey.
Title
Strongly encourages State Board of Medical Examiners to adopt regulations as necessary to authorize radiologist assistants to practice in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR21 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/ACR32 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/ACR/32_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=ACR32 |