NJ AJR11 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR202
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR90
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR90
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates fourth week of March of each year as "Military Caregivers Week."
Title
Designates fourth week of March of each year as "Military Caregivers Week."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR11 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
AJR90 (Carry Over) 2016-04-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
AJR90 (Carry Over) 2016-04-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AJR11 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AJR/11_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR11 |