NJ AJR112 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, JR-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, JR-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates May of each year as "Cystic Fibrosis Awareness Month."
Title
Designates May of each year as "Cystic Fibrosis Awareness Month."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For Sjr86 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, JR-15. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Substituted for SJR86 |
2015-12-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2015-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (67-0-0) |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR86 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by AJR112
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/AJR112 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/AJR/112_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR112 |