NJ AJR125 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Approved P.L.2018, JR-7.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Designates June 20th annually as "World Refugee Day" in New Jersey.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates June 20th annually as "World Refugee Day" in New Jersey.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SJR85 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17SenateApproved P.L.2018, JR-7.
2018-06-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-1)
2018-06-25SenateSubstituted for SJR85
2018-05-31SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-05-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (69-2-0)
2018-05-17AssemblyIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

SJR85 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by AJR125

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback