NJ AJR134 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR73
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR155
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR173
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR15
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR155
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR173
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR15
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates first full week of June each year as "New Jersey Fishing and Boating Week."
Title
Designates first full week of June each year as "New Jersey Fishing and Boating Week."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR134 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
AJR134 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
AJR173 (Carry Over) 2018-11-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
SJR66 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
SJR15 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
AJR134 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
AJR173 (Carry Over) 2018-11-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
SJR66 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
SJR15 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/AJR134 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/AJR/134_I1.HTM |