NJ AJR150 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-22.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-22.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates October 8 of each year as "Hydrogen and Fuel Cell Day" in NJ.
Title
Designates October 8 of each year as "Hydrogen and Fuel Cell Day" in NJ.
Sponsors
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] |
Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SJR152 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, JR-22. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-0) |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Substituted for SJR152 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2018-09-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR152 (Same As) 2019-09-12 - Substituted by AJR150