NJ AJR164 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "New Jersey Advanced Autonomous Vehicle Task Force."
Title
Establishes "New Jersey Advanced Autonomous Vehicle Task Force."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SJR105 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SJR105 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, JR-2. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Substituted for SJR105 (1R) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2018-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR105 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by AJR164 (2R)