NJ AJR177 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR12
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-03 - Approved P.L.2021, JR-8.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-03 - Approved P.L.2021, JR-8.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates December 4 of each year as "Alpha Phi Alpha Day" in New Jersey.
Title
Designates December 4 of each year as "Alpha Phi Alpha Day" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SJR86 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SJR86 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-03 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, JR-8. |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Substituted for SJR86 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR177 (Carry Over) 2021-12-03 - Approved P.L.2021, JR-8.
SJR86 (Same As) 2021-12-02 - Substituted by AJR177
SJR86 (Same As) 2021-12-02 - Substituted by AJR177
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/AJR177 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/AJR/177_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR177 |